Environment, Department of

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0026
    (SB0133)
Community Healthy Air ActDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Environment (M3)
HB0161
    (SB0187 / CH0010)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
HB0219 / CH0162
    (SB0115 / CH0161)
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board - Membership and DutiesDelegate BeitzelApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Environment and Transportation
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0538
    (SB0651)
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - ProhibitionDelegate LiermanIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0766
    (SB0610)
Forest Conservation – Technical Study and Programmatic ReviewDelegate HealeyIn the House - Third Reading Passed (114-25)Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0850Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box SpringsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0866Maryland Energy Administration - Study on Location of Solar Photovoltaic TechnologiesDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB0917 / CH0275
    (SB1032 / CH0274)
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionFrederick County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 275Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0961 / CH0176Rural Broadband Communication ServicesDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 176Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1077
    (SB1070)
Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline StabilizationDelegate BeitzelIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB1350 / CH0628
    (SB1006 / CH0629)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 628Environment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1360Environment - Sewage Sludge - Land ApplicationDelegate RoseIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1381Environmental Violations - Reporting RequirementsDelegate LaffertyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1426Natural Resources - Aquaculture Leases and Public Shellfish Fishery AreasDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1428Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic DistrictsDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - Second Reading PassedEnvironment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1532 / CH0404
    (SB0991 / CH0405)
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersDelegate Howard, S.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404Ways and Means
3/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1597 / CH0796Occupational Licenses or Certificates – Application Determinations – Use of Criminal History – ReportsDelegate SydnorApproved by the Governor - Chapter 796Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1722Environment - Lead Hazards - Environmental Investigation, Reporting, and Risk ReductionDelegate HolmesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
HB1765 / CH0585On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial AssistanceDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 585Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1826Environment - Water Pollution Control - Water Quality CertificationDelegate RobinsonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0100 / CH0063Reservoir, Dam, or Waterway Obstruction Plans - Designation of Approval AuthorityChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 63Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0115 / CH0161
    (HB0219 / CH0162)
Deep Creek Lake Policy and Review Board – Membership and DutiesSenator EdwardsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 161Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0133
    (HB0026)
Community Healthy Air ActSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0187 / CH0010
    (HB0161)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2018PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 10Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsOperating Budget (B1)
SB0496 / CH0705Environment – Graywater – Residential UseSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 705Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0651
    (HB0538)
Environment - Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products - ProhibitionSenator KaganIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0844 / CH0630Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of AuthoritySenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 630Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0991 / CH0405
    (HB1532 / CH0404)
Higher Education - Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program - FarmersSenator JenningsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 405Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB1006 / CH0629
    (HB1350 / CH0628)
Sea Level Rise Inundation and Coastal Flooding - Construction, Adaptation, and MitigationSenator PinskyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 629Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1032 / CH0274
    (HB0917 / CH0275)
Frederick County - Scenic River Advisory Board - CompositionSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 274Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB1070
    (HB1077)
Wetlands and Waterways Program – State–Owned Lakes – Structural Shoreline StabilizationSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:43 A.M.