Environmental Health

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0016
    (SB0261)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsDelegate AroraIn the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsState Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
HB0095 / CH0608Environment - Permits - New Source Performance StandardsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 608Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0102 / CH0425
    (SB0127)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 425Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0917Real Property - Property Used for Methamphetamine Production - Disclosure and QuarantineDelegate Washington, M.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)Health and Government Operations
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB0986 / CH0397
    (SB0896)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - PermitsDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 397Health and Government Operations
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1115 / CH0404
    (SB0593)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilityDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 404Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judicial Proceedings
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1134Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on MarylandDelegate WaldstreicherIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0261
    (HB0016)
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted RegulationsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Regulations and Procedures (P3)
SB0400 / CH0254Environmental Health Specialists - Licensure Examinations - Applicant Qualifications and WaiverSenator GlassmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 254Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0593
    (HB1115 / CH0404)
Health Occupations Boards - License Renewal, Investigation of Alleged Violations, and Immunity from LiabilitySenator MontgomeryVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0601Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013Senator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0879Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0896
    (HB0986 / CH0397)
State Board of Pharmacy - Sterile Compounding - PermitsSenator ConwayIn the House - Rereferred to Health and Government OperationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.