Environmental Health

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0057Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0183 / CH0779Prince George's County Environmental Justice Commission PG 411-18Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 779Environment and Transportation
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/9/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0233Task Force to Study Health and Safety Standards for Rental Housing in Prince George's County PG 410-18Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Generally (L1)
HB0850Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box SpringsDelegate HillIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Environment (M3)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0947
    (SB0958)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsDelegate BeitzelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1055State Finance and Procurement - Chesapeake Bay Watershed States - Expenses and Contracts (Quit Polluting My Bay Act of 2018)Delegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1212Public Health - Sale or Distribution of Trichloroethylene - ProhibitionDelegate LamIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1217 / CH0235
    (SB0924 / CH0234)
Local Government – Splash Pads – RegulationsDelegate LiermanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1249Crab Harvest – Start Time – Days in JulyDelegate AdamsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0138
    (HB0003 / CH0627)
Environment - U.S. Climate Alliance - MembershipSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationEnvironment (M3)
SB0873Constitutional Amendment - Right to Healthy Environment and CommunitiesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0924 / CH0234
    (HB1217 / CH0235)
Local Government – Splash Pads – RegulationsSenator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0958
    (HB0947)
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Purpose and Authorized Use of FundsSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.