Environmental Matters

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0129BayStat Program and BayStat Subcabinet - RenamingChair, Environment and Transportation CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0164Environment - Lynch Cove Run - Soil TestingDelegate GrammerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0171 / CH0384
    (SB0099 / CH0383)
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - StudyDelegate RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environment and Transportation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0281
    (SB0266)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - ProhibitionDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0414
    (SB0355 / CH0388)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsDelegate BarkleyIn the Senate - Rereferred to FinanceEconomic Matters
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
FinanceUtility Regulation (C5)
HB0417 / CH0366
    (SB0314 / CH0367)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0970Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient OptionsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1050
    (SB1065)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateDelegate Miller, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1063 / CH0373Agriculture - Maryland Healthy Soils ProgramDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 373Environment and Transportation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1239
    (SB0280)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingDelegate FrushIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1330Large Family Child Care Homes and Child Care Centers - Green Product Cleaning Supplies - RegulationsDelegate AngelIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1349 / CH0374Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - LabelingDelegate RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 374Environment and Transportation
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
HB1545
    (SB1071)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hard Bargain Farm Environmental CenterDelegate ValderramaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1592
    (SB0931)
Local Jurisdictions - Zoning Authority - Generating StationsDelegate JamesonIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
HJ0010
    (SJ0008)
Chesapeake Bay Restoration - Federal Budget Blueprint Funding Reductions - Rescission RequestDelegate BarveIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsRules and Executive Nominations
4/8/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0099 / CH0383
    (HB0171 / CH0384)
Department of the Environment - Yard Waste, Food Residuals, and Other Organic Materials Diversion and Infrastructure - StudySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 383Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0158 / CH0390Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 390Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0266
    (HB0281)
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen RemovalSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0280
    (HB1239)
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and LabelingSenator GuzzoneIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersEnvironment (M3)
SB0314 / CH0367
    (HB0417 / CH0366)
Clean Water Commerce Act of 2017PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 367Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0355 / CH0388
    (HB0414)
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Environmental Remediation CostsSenator SerafiniApproved by the Governor - Chapter 388Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0440 / CH0370
    (HB0557 / CH0371)
Environment - Water Management - Sediment Control at Large Redevelopment SitesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 370Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0703 / CH0394Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Participation in the Readiness and Environmental Protection Integration ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 394Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0931
    (HB1592)
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Consistency With Comprehensive PlanSenator AstleIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive NominationsLocal Government - Generally (L6)
SB1065
    (HB1050)
Transportation - I-270/US 15 Multi-Modal Corridor Study and West Side Mobility Study - Review and UpdateSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB1067Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Chesapeake Children's MuseumSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1071
    (HB1545)
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Hard Bargain Farm Environmental CenterSenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 10:57 A.M.