Estates and Trusts

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0008
    (SB0168 / CH0196)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsDelegate VitaleVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0125Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's FeesDelegate StukesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0280Maryland Death Taxes - Family Property Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0658Estates and Trusts - Forms for Modified AdministrationDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
HB0722Estate Taxes - Qualified Family-Owned Business Property - ExclusionDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB0857 / CH0644Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived ChildDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 644Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0858 / CH0645
    (SB0170)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 645Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0859 / CH0646Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property TrustsDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0946Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death ActDelegate CarrIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0965Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal InterestDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1031 / CH0518
    (SB0658 / CH0517)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceDelegate HixsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Income (Q3)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1246
    (SB0469)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1271Courts - Unauthorized Use of Name or LikenessDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1328
    (SB0332 / CH0455)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesDelegate SmigielVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1492
    (SB0387)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0029Estates and Trusts - Personal Representative - Administration of Internet-Based AccountsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0168 / CH0196
    (HB0008)
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship Accounts - Form and LimitsSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 196Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0170
    (HB0858 / CH0645)
Estates and Trusts - Modified Administration and Inheritance TaxSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0198 / CH0204Estates and Trusts - Family AllowanceSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 204Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0252Maryland Estate Tax - Unified CreditSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0332 / CH0455
    (HB1328)
Estates and Trusts - Special and Supplemental Needs Trusts - Regulations by State AgenciesSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 455Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0387
    (HB1492)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0469
    (HB1246)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0649Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0658 / CH0517
    (HB1031 / CH0518)
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health InsuranceSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 517Budget and Taxation
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0891Courts - Service of Process - Driver of Motor Vehicle or Driver's EstateSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0982Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (The Mike Cady Act)Senator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.