Ethics

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 32

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0141Ethics Law - Soliciting the Employment of LobbyistDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0142General Assembly - Advocating for or Directing an Entity to Hire a Member's Relative - ProhibitedDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0143Former Members of the General Assembly and Former Legislative Branch Officials - Employment RestrictionsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0144Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former OfficialsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0222General Assembly - Disclosure of Financial InterestsDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0362 / CH0615Public Ethics - Definition of "Interest" - Mutual FundsChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 615Environmental Matters
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB0381
    (SB0495)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeDelegate TarrantIn the House - First Reading Environmental MattersEnvironmental MattersState Government - General Assembly (P5)
HB0447Election Law - Use of Campaign Funds for Meeting and Conference ExpensesDelegate HowardIn the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0474
    (SB0611)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActDelegate ReznikIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1023Public Ethics - Blind Industries and Services of MarylandDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1044
    (SB0584)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsDelegate CardinIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1113Procurement - Disclosure Requirements and PenaltiesDelegate BohananIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB1193Ethics - Lobbying Registration - State and Local Government Entities and AssociationsDelegate HuckerIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1397
    (SB1065)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementDelegate BoboIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEthics (G2)
HB1429 / CH0418Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Former Officials and Employees - EmploymentChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 418Environmental Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
HB1454Task Force to Study the Terms, Pay, Operations, and Ethical Standards for Various Elected Officials in Prince George's County PG 422-13Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)Environmental Matters
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1499 / CH0419
    (SB1039)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 419Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsElections (G1)
HS0001In Re: Delegate William "Tony" McConkey Resolution of ReprimandSpeakerIn the House - Adopted (127-3)State Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0316
    (HB0432)
Frederick County - Ethics - Former Officials and EmployeesSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0453Election Law and Ethics - Political Parties - Uniform Transparency, Disclosure, and Accountability ActSenator MannoIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0495
    (HB0381)
General Assembly Members - Business Communications as Private Citizens - NoticeSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledRulesState Government - General Assembly (P5)
SB0545Legislative Immunity - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0546Immunity of Local Government Officials - Prosecutions for BriberySenator FroshIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0584
    (HB1044)
Public Funding and Small Donor Act for General Assembly ElectionsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0611
    (HB0474)
Health Occupations - Maryland Behavior Analysts ActSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0665Public Ethics Laws - Meals - Regulated Lobbyist Reporting RequirementsSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB0695Public Ethics - General Assembly - Employment with Political Subdivisions and Public Institutions of Higher EducationSenator FergusonIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesEthics (G2)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0869Public Ethics - Members of the General Assembly - Meals, Receptions, and BeveragesSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 9:00 a.m.Rules
3/13/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
Ethics (G2)
SB1039
    (HB1499 / CH0419)
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsElections (G1)
SB1065
    (HB1397)
Public Ethics - Public Officials, Local Governments, and Lobbyists - Training, Reporting, and EnforcementSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsEthics (G2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.