Ethnic Affairs

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0539Election Law - Voter Registration and Absentee Voting - Proof of CitizenshipDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0732
    (SB0504)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social HallDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0814
    (SB0729)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch OfficeDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1222Maryland School Discipline Reform ActDelegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1225 / CH0558
    (SB0340 / CH0559)
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All PoliciesDelegate Lewis, R.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 558Health and Government Operations
3/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Public Health (J1)
HB1268Education - Student Achievement Gap Standard - Establishment (Maryland Student Achievement Act)Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1519
    (SB0471)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquityDelegate Lewis, R.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; WithdrawnAppropriations
3/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB1635Baltimore Police Department - Reporting on Community PolicingDelegate AliIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1648Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - DiversityDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPublic Health (J1)
HB1660
    (SB0695)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax MuseumDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/11/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0244Task Force to Study Suspension Rates of African American Prekindergarten StudentsSenator RobinsonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0340 / CH0559
    (HB1225 / CH0558)
University of Maryland School of Public Health, Center for Health Equity - Workgroup on Health in All PoliciesSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0471
    (HB1519)
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and EquitySenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
SB0503 / CH0499Health Occupations Boards - Racial and Ethnic Health DisparitiesSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 499Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0504
    (HB0732)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Young Israel Shomrai Emunah Social HallSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0695
    (HB1660)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - National Great Blacks in Wax MuseumSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0729
    (HB0814)
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Korean Community Service Center Branch OfficeSenator SmithIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1197Public Health - Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission - Membership, Licensing, and StudiesSenator MillerIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.