Eviction

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0249 / CH0489
    (SB0345 / CH0488)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsDelegate McMillanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489Environmental Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB0422
    (SB0991)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedDelegate HixsonIn the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0645Real Property - Landlord Defenses in Nuisance ActionsDelegate WeirIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0843Residential Leases - Just Cause EvictionsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0946
    (SB0181)
Residential Leases - Just-Cause EvictionDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1077Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Service of ProcessDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1328
    (SB0865 / CH0567)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsDelegate SwainIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Real Property (N1)
HB1529
    (SB1095)
Real Property - Ground RentsDelegate McIntoshIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0174Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of PaymentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0181
    (HB0946)
Residential Leases - Just-Cause EvictionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0345 / CH0488
    (HB0249 / CH0489)
Real Property - Residential Leases - Interest on Security DepositsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 488Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0800 / CH0556
    (HB1108)
Landlord and Tenant - Retaliatory Actions - Conditions for ReliefSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 556Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0865 / CH0567
    (HB1328)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Transparency Requirements and Member RightsSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 567Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0904Residential Leases - Rental Fees - Landlord and Tenant Relations (Maryland Rental Housing Stabilization Act)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0991
    (HB0422)
Dogs - Discrimination Based on Breed, Type, or Heritage - ProhibitedSenator KingIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Counties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1095
    (HB1529)
Real Property - Ground RentsSenator FroshIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudicial Proceedings
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.