Eviction

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 7

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0494
    (SB0555)
Safe Neighborhoods ActDelegate BeidleIn the Senate - Third Reading Failed (20-22)Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0680
    (SB0021)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction ProceduresDelegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0995Montgomery County - Residential Leases - Just Cause Eviction MC 15-18Montgomery County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1553 / CH0637
    (SB0826 / CH0638)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsDelegate AndersonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 637Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB0021
    (HB0680)
Maryland Cooperative Housing Act - Dispute Settlement and Eviction ProceduresSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/23/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0555
    (HB0494)
Safe Neighborhoods ActSenator HoughIn the House - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0826 / CH0638
    (HB1553 / CH0637)
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - False Representations and Unlawful EvictionsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 638Judicial Proceedings
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:05 P.M.