Examinations

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0136 / CH0106Insurance - Public AdjustersChair, Economic Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 106Economic Matters
1/26/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0142
    (SB0033)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0191Optometrists and Physicians - Prescriptions for Lenses - Expiration DatesDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0205Drivers' Licenses - Learners' Permits - Minimum DurationDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
2/9/2017 - 1:15 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0482 / CH0515
    (SB0385 / CH0516)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB0513Education - Participants in Interscholastic Athletic Activities - Concussions - Penalties for CoachesDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0652
    (SB0335)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017Delegate McCrayIn the House - Referred to interim study by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0675 / CH0676
    (SB0061 / CH0677)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisDelegate Sample-HughesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 676Health and Government Operations
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0834Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementDelegate KittlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1053Integrated Community Oncology Reporting ProgramDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Health and Government Operations
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1277 / CH0505Insurance - Producer Licensing - ExaminationsDelegate DavisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 505Economic Matters
3/2/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB1556
    (SB0090)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of RefusalDelegate Young, K.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0033
    (HB0142)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsChair, Finance CommitteeIn the House - First Reading Economic MattersFinance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 a.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0061 / CH0677
    (HB0675 / CH0676)
Health Insurance - Coverage for Digital TomosynthesisSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 677Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
SB0090
    (HB1556)
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Classwork and Assessment Involving Live and Dead Animals - Student Right of RefusalSenator YoungIn the Senate - Second Reading FailedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2017 - 3:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0263Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test RequirementSenator BatesIn the Senate - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0335
    (HB0652)
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2017Senator RosapepeIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0385 / CH0516
    (HB0482 / CH0515)
Maryland Nurse Practice Act - RevisionsSenator Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 516Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0864Education - Overdose on Public School Premises - Substance Abuse Treatment ProgramsSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)Finance
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Public Health (J1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.