Excise Tax

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 22

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0176Transportation Trust Fund Protection ActDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)Appropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB0412
    (SB0451)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0524
    (SB0643)
Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesAppropriations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
RulesTransportation - Generally (R2)
HB0548
    (SB0090 / CH0180)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Maximum TaxDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0721
    (SB0485)
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased VehiclesDelegate CardinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and MeansVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0791 / CH0389
    (SB0728)
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - ExtensionsDelegate McHaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 389Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0836 / CH0065
    (SB0600 / CH0064)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesDelegate MaloneApproved by the Governor - Chapter 65Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0999Worcester County - Alcoholic BeveragesWorcester County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAlcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB1046Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB1302Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and FairnessDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1515 / CH0429
    (SB1054)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 429Ways and Means
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0090 / CH0180
    (HB0548)
Natural Resources - Vessel Excise Tax - Waterway Improvement FundSenator AstleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0253Transportation Trust Fund - Dedicated Highway FundsSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0451
    (HB0412)
Vessel Excise Tax - Exemption for Commercial Enterprises Paying the Admissions and Amusement TaxSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0485
    (HB0721)
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased VehiclesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0600 / CH0064
    (HB0836 / CH0065)
Vehicle Laws - Electric VehiclesSenator GaragiolaApproved by the Governor - Chapter 64Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0636Motor Vehicle Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles - Application of Trade-In ValueSenator MannoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Transportation (Q5)
SB0643
    (HB0524)
End the GridlockSenator RosapepeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB0728
    (HB0791 / CH0389)
Tax Credits - Electric Vehicles - ExtensionsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
SB0829 / CH0422Transportation Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator MillerAssigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 422Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Appropriations
Ways and Means
Transportation - Generally (R2)
SB1054
    (HB1515 / CH0429)
Transportation Infrastructure Investment Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesTaxes - Transportation (Q5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.