Ex-Offenders

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0032Drunk Driving - Transporting Minor - Ignition Interlock System ProgramDelegate AroraIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/23/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)
HB0054
    (SB0354)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistryDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0326
    (SB0333)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0442 / CH0052
    (SB0415 / CH0051)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0541
    (SB0571)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0698 / CH0241
    (SB0356 / CH0240)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudyDelegate Pena-MelnykApproved by the Governor - Chapter 241Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0710
    (SB0493)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again ProjectDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB1053 / CH0041
    (SB0282 / CH0040)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41Ways and Means
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1133Public Safety - Restrictions on Possession of Firearms - Convicted Felons and People with Mental DisordersDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/1/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/1/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1350Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services - Reinvestment of Savings to Prisoner Reentry ProgramsDelegate McConkeyIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1403
    (SB0635)
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry RestrictionsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0282 / CH0040
    (HB1053 / CH0041)
Video Lottery Facilities - Employee Licenses - Crimes of Moral Turpitude or GamblingSenator Jones-RodwellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 40Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0333
    (HB0326)
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistrySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0354
    (HB0054)
Criminal Procedure - State Vulnerable-Adult Abuser RegistrySenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0356 / CH0240
    (HB0698 / CH0241)
Ex-Offender Business Development Program StudySenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Finance
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0415 / CH0051
    (HB0442 / CH0052)
Criminal History Records Checks - Child Care ProvidersSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 51Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0493
    (HB0710)
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Learn'In to Live Again ProjectSenator PughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 9:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0571
    (HB0541)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of RehabilitationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0635
    (HB1403)
Criminal Procedure - Sex Offender - Entry RestrictionsSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0649Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.