Ex-Offenders

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0068
    (SB0444)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0236
    (SB0208)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0309 / CH0114
    (SB0334 / CH0113)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Family Law (D4)
HB0379Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse RegistryDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0642
    (SB0608 / CH0182)
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - ExpansionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Safety (E4)
HB0656
    (SB0321 / CH0291)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsDelegate ReadyVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0796
    (SB0669 / CH0189)
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of LawDelegate Turner, V.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Health and Government Operations
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0841State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists and State Board of Social Work Examiners - Grounds for Denying Licenses and CertificatesDelegate SmigielIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0921
    (SB0398 / CH0162)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionDelegate HoughIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0993Registered Sex Offenders - Prohibition - Halloween ActivitiesDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1072Nursing Homes and Assisted Living Facilities - Sex OffendersDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Care Facilities and Regulation (J3)
HB1160
    (SB0919)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentDelegate BarnesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1324Maryland Youth Employment Act of 2014Delegate Washington, A.In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0208
    (HB0236)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Family Law (D4)
SB0321 / CH0291
    (HB0656)
Estates and Trusts - Personal Representatives and Guardians - StandardsSenator GettyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 291Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0334 / CH0113
    (HB0309 / CH0114)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0398 / CH0162
    (HB0921)
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of CompletionSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 162Judicial Proceedings
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0444
    (HB0068)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0608 / CH0182
    (HB0642)
Correctional Services - Swift and Certain Sanctions Pilot Program - ExpansionSenator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 182Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0669 / CH0189
    (HB0796)
Procurement - Debarment - Violations of LawSenator RamirezApproved by the Governor - Chapter 189Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0838Private Process Servers - LicensingSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0919
    (HB1160)
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Services - EstablishmentSenator FergusonIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.