Ex-Offenders

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society StatusDelegate FennellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Human Relations (D5)
HB0264 / CH0480Task Force to Investigate the Challenges of and Opportunities for Minorities in BusinessDelegate Robinson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 480Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0284Senior Apartment Facilities - Limitation on Occupancy by Person Convicted of Crime of ViolenceDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0498Correctional Services - Senior Reentry Coordinating CouncilDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0510Program for the Long-Term Employment of Qualified Ex-FelonsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)Economic Matters
2/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0716Election Law - Voting by Felons at Polling Places - ProhibitionDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 2:30 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0748Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning - Job Training Grant Program - EstablishmentDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersPrivate Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB0846Public Safety - Crime Gun Reporting and AnalysisDelegate ReyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0858Enterprise Zone Income Tax Credit - ExpansionDelegate SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/4/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0979
    (SB0923)
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition and Task ForceDelegate BarronIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1126Prince George's County Pretrial Release, Work Release, and Diversion Programs Task Force PG 307-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB1151
    (SB0547)
Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction ActDelegate McCrayIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1195Task Force to Reduce Recidivism and Reform Correctional EducationDelegate LamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1232
    (SB0978)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1259Election Law - Voting by Registered Offenders at Polling Places - ProhibitionDelegate ImpallariaIn the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB1268 / CH0506Calvert County - Pretrial Release Program - Nonviolent FelonCalvert County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 506Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0546Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of RestrictionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0547
    (HB1151)
Ex-Offenders Recidivism Reduction ActSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0804State Government - Occupational Licensing of Ex-Offenders - Transfer of Statutory ProvisionsSenator PughIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0923
    (HB0979)
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of ProhibitionSenator RosapepeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0978
    (HB1232)
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting TimeSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)
SB1101Jurors - Qualification - Prior ConvictionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCourts and Court Personnel - Statewide (D1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.