Expungement

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0255 / CH0093Allegany County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsAllegany County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 93Appropriations
2/5/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0282
    (SB0229)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judiciary CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB0480Criminal Procedure - Explanation of Expungement Provisions Relating to Proposed Disposition of ChargeDelegate StukesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0854 / CH0643
    (SB0479)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0899
    (SB0550)
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - RevisionDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1029
    (SB0783)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsDelegate OaksIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1096 / CH0401
    (SB0672)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationDelegate HammenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1475
    (SB1070)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1523Public Safety - DNA Samples and Records - Collection, Use, Storage, and ExpungementDelegate CarterIn the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0229
    (HB0282)
Courts - Juveniles - Expungement of RecordsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0479
    (HB0854 / CH0643)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records - Not Criminally ResponsibleSenator GladdenIn the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0550
    (HB0899)
State Board of Physicians - Disciplinary and Licensure Procedures - RevisionSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0672
    (HB1096 / CH0401)
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSenator ConwayVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0783
    (HB1029)
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic DoctorsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1070
    (HB1475)
Baltimore County - Correctional Officers' Bill of RightsSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsJudicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.