Expungement

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 18

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0382 / CH0686Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Civil OffenseDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 686Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0487Law Enforcement Misconduct - Erroneous Conviction Compensation and ExpungementDelegate AliIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0488Criminal Law - Third-Degree AssaultDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0555
    (SB0257)
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as AdultsDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
2/8/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB1057Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Denial of Petition Without HearingDelegate SanchezIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1082
    (SB0593)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1193Physicians – Discipline – Procedures and EffectsDelegate WestIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1267
    (SB0869)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1276
    (SB0881)
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution OffensesDelegate ChangIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1383
    (SB1212)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Delegate MosbyIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0079 / CH0413Child Support - Employment Program Participation - Reinstatement of Driver's License and Expungement of SuspensionChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 413Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0101 / CH0143Criminal Law – Crimes of Violence, Expungement, and Drug TreatmentSenator NormanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 143Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0257
    (HB0555)
Juvenile Law - Records - Juveniles Charged as AdultsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/1/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0593
    (HB1082)
Justice Reinvestment Act - ModificationsSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2018 - 3:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0869
    (HB1267)
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human TraffickingSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0881
    (HB1276)
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution OffensesSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCriminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1212
    (HB1383)
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Expansion (Maryland Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment (REDEEM) Act of 2018)Senator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB1246Criminal Procedure - Partial ExpungementSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRulesCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:10 P.M.