Facsimile Transmission

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 3

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0702 / CH0068
    (SB0622 / CH0067)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 68Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCorporations and Associations (C1)
SB0279 / CH0157
    (HB0224 / CH0158)
Election Law - Improving Access to VotingPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
SB0622 / CH0067
    (HB0702 / CH0068)
Corporations and Associations - Document Filing and ProcessingSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 67Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCorporations and Associations (C1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.