Fairs

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0194 / CH0048
    (SB0101 / CH0047)
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB0309 / CH0305Montgomery County - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Festival License MC 7-17Montgomery County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 305Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills (A2)
HB0780Alcoholic Beverages - Brewing Company Off-Site Permits - Harford County Farm FairDelegate LisantiIn the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEconomic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills (A1)
SB0101 / CH0047
    (HB0194 / CH0048)
St. Mary's County - Licensing and Operation of Amusement Devices - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 47Budget and Taxation
2/1/2017 - 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)

Denotes enacted legislation

April 26, 2017 1:46 P.M.