Family Law

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0010
    (SB0052)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorDelegate Haddaway-RiccioIn the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0022
    (SB0165)
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion ServicesDelegate Nathan-PulliamIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
1/17/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0245 / CH0090Family Law - Substance-Exposed NewbornsChair, Judiciary CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 90Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0631 / CH0380
    (SB0534)
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or NeglectDelegate HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Judiciary
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0687 / CH0633Commission on Child Custody Decision MakingDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 633Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0715
    (SB0620)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0748
    (SB0503)
Family Law - Grounds for DivorceDelegate SimmonsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0853
    (SB0417)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersDelegate DumaisIn the Senate - Conference Committee AppointedJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0872Family Law - Modification of Child Custody or Denial of Visitation - Expedited HearingsDelegate CarterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1099
    (SB0792)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1480Family Law - Unattended Child Under the Age of ThreeDelegate GlennIn the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; WithdrawnRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
SB0052
    (HB0010)
Family Law - Denial of Custody or Visitation - Sexual Abuse of a MinorSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0104Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time RequirementsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0165
    (HB0022)
Adoption - Access to Birth and Adoption Records and Search, Contact, and Reunion ServicesSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0178Family Law - Blood or Genetic Test Results - Legal Finding of PaternityChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0181Family Law - Child Support - Presumptive Support ObligationChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0417
    (HB0853)
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Permanent Final Protective OrdersSenator ForehandIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0503
    (HB0748)
Family Law - Grounds for DivorceSenator ZirkinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0534
    (HB0631 / CH0380)
Family Law - Preventing or Interfering with Report of Suspected Child Abuse or NeglectSenator ShankIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0579
    (HB0849)
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily AdjustmentSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0620
    (HB0715)
Family Law - Denial of Paternity, Custody, and VisitationSenator RaskinIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0792
    (HB1099)
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction ActSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB1024Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - DisseminationSenator ShankIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.