Family Law

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0001 / CH0004
    (SB0002 / CH0003)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Delegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 4Judiciary
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0306 / CH0179State Personnel - Rights and Protections for Nursing MothersDelegate KrimmApproved by the Governor - Chapter 179Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB1271Family Law – Opioid–Exposed Newborns and Parents Addicted to Opioids – Mobile Application (I’m Alive Today App)Delegate McKayIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB1483 / CH0287Duties of a Guardian of the Person - VisitationDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 287Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1507Compulsory School Attendance - Truancy Violations - Reporting of NeglectDelegate AngelIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1628Privileged Communications – Mental Health Providers – Exception for Suspected Child Abuse and NeglectDelegate HettlemanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
HB1736
    (SB1140 / CH0623)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Lot ReleaseDelegate LisantiIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsAgriculture (M4)
SB0002 / CH0003
    (HB0001 / CH0004)
Family Law - Child Conceived Without Consent - Termination of Parental Rights (Rape Survivor Family Protection Act)Senator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Judicial Proceedings
1/11/2018 - 1:15 p.m.
JudiciaryFamily Law (D4)
SB1140 / CH0623
    (HB1736)
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation – Definition of ChildSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 623Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB1238Family Law - Grandparent VisitationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 18, 2018 4:03 P.M.