Farmland

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 14

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0106
    (SB0391)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0226 / CH0003
    (SB0275)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 3Economic Matters
2/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0378 / CH0108Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Fund - Easement Restriction - ReimbursementDelegate StocksdaleApproved by the Governor - Chapter 108Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0400
    (SB0364)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingDelegate SteinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0796
    (SB0427)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertyDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0837Family Farm - Prevailing Party - Attorney's Fees and ExpensesDelegate McDermottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1104
    (SB0821)
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit OrganizationsDelegate AfzaliIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
SB0275
    (HB0226 / CH0003)
Maryland Offshore Wind Energy Act of 2013PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0364
    (HB0400)
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and GrazingSenator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0391
    (HB0106)
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - RepealSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0427
    (HB0796)
Income Tax Credit - Agricultural Land - Diminution in Value of Real PropertySenator GlassmanIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0821
    (HB1104)
Food Processing Plants - License Fees - Farms and Civic and Nonprofit OrganizationsSenator YoungIn the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1029 / CH0339Maryland Agricultural Certainty ProgramSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 339Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)

Denotes enacted legislation

October 30, 2013 7:43 A.M.