Farmland

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0014 / CH0216Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Retired Members of the Armed ForcesDelegate O'DonnellApproved by the Governor - Chapter 216Environment and Transportation
2/5/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0252
    (SB0284)
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - OccurrenceDelegate WaldstreicherIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsAgriculture (M4)
HB0381
    (SB0257)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0540 / CH0015
    (SB0122 / CH0014)
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - RevisionsDelegate MautzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15Health and Government Operations
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0701
    (SB0463)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0803 / CH0456Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - LegalizationDelegate Fraser-HidalgoApproved by the Governor - Chapter 456Environment and Transportation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB0812 / CH0281Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to FarmsDelegate HornbergerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 281Environment and Transportation
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB1075
    (SB0470)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationAgriculture (M4)
SB0008Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - RevisionsSenator GettyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinancePublic Health (J1)
SB0068 / CH0147Charles County and St. Mary's County - Deer Management PermitSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 147Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0122 / CH0014
    (HB0540 / CH0015)
Public Health - Regulation of Milk Products - RevisionsSenator EckardtApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14Finance
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0257
    (HB0381)
Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Management ToolSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0284
    (HB0252)
Jane Lawton Farm-to-School Program - Maryland Homegrown School Lunch Week - OccurrenceSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0463
    (HB0701)
Agriculture - Cattle, Swine, and Poultry - Use of Antimicrobial DrugsSenator PinskyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0470
    (HB1075)
Agriculture - Antibiotic Drug Usage - Food-Producing AnimalsSenator Nathan-PulliamIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0766 / CH0197Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate DeterminationSenator ReadyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 197Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.