Fiduciaries

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0437
    (SB0753)
Maryland Trust ActDelegate SimmonsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB0859 / CH0646Interests in Grantor and Qualified Terminable Interest Property TrustsDelegate WaldstreicherApproved by the Governor - Chapter 646Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0753
    (HB0437)
Maryland Trust ActSenator StoneIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.