Financial Institutions

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0458Personal and Business Documents - EvidenceDelegate NiemannIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0498Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory ReviewDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB0522
    (SB0465)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB0814Commercial Law - Debt Collection - Attachment FeesDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
2/22/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0860 / CH0647
    (SB0743)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Baltimore City DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 647Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB0930Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0960
    (SB0859)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate LeeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1211 / CH0486
    (SB0489 / CH0485)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Delegate SchulzApproved by the Governor - Chapter 486Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HB1219Consumer Protection - Required Notice by Financial Institutions - Nonpublic Personal InformationDelegate CullisonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1246
    (SB0469)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Delegate LuedtkeIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/8/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1249Baltimore City - School Construction - Block GrantsDelegate HaynesIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education - Miscellaneous (F5)
HB1306Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task ForceDelegate GutierrezIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1368Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - RevisionsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1452Linked Deposit Program for Small BusinessesDelegate VaughnIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersState Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1463Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of FeesDelegate FrickIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
HJ0003Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/4/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0070 / CH0175Business and Economic Development - Enterprise Fund and Invest Maryland ProgramChair, Budget and Taxation CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0071Child Support Enforcement - Attachment and Seizure of Retirement Accounts and Claims Against Retirement PlansChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
1/10/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0465
    (HB0522)
Refinancing of First Mortgage Loans - SubordinationSenator KlausmeierIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial Proceedings
Finance
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0469
    (HB1246)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2013Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0489 / CH0485
    (HB1211 / CH0486)
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)Senator ShankApproved by the Governor - Chapter 485Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0743
    (HB0860 / CH0647)
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013Senator Jones-RodwellIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and TaxationRules and Executive NominationsEducation - Miscellaneous (F5)
SB0859
    (HB0960)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1016Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FroshIn the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersFinance
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB1072 / CH0345Linked Deposit Programs for Small Businesses and Minority Business EnterprisesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/6/2013 - 10:30 a.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.