Financial Institutions

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0202 / CH0473
    (SB0186 / CH0472)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsDelegate BarkleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 473Economic Matters
2/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB0550
    (SB0812)
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to ObligeeDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0595 / CH0233Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial InstitutionsDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 233Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Real Property (N1)
HB0714 / CH0237
    (SB0810)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsDelegate LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 237Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0728
    (SB0222)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Real Property (N1)
HB0735
    (SB0583 / CH0306)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsDelegate OlszewskiVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1021Prince George's County - Foreclosure - Report by Department of Housing and Community Development and Commissioner of Financial Regulation PG 411-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesEnvironmental Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules Real Property (N1)
HB1165 / CH0349
    (SB0875 / CH0348)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 349Economic Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
HB1298
    (SB0395)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Delegate HealeyIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1322
    (SB0755)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudyDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1365Corporations and Associations - Securities - Maryland Small Business Funding ActDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing cancelledRules and Executive Nominations Corporations and Associations (C1)
HB1371Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate AroraIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HJ0008
    (SJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate BraveboyIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0186 / CH0472
    (HB0202 / CH0473)
Clean Energy Loan Programs - Private Lenders - Collection of Loan PaymentsSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 472Finance
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Local Government - Generally (L6)
SB0222
    (HB0728)
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned PropertiesSenator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0395
    (HB1298)
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014Senator PinskyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0583 / CH0306
    (HB0735)
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific Purpose Savings AccountsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 306Finance
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0755
    (HB1322)
Foreclosure - Moratorium, Notices, Penalties, Redemption Period, and StudySenator MuseIn the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0810
    (HB0714 / CH0237)
Criminal Law - Identity Fraud - ProhibitionsSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0812
    (HB0550)
Child Support - Income Tax Refund Intercept - Priority of Requests and Information to ObligeeSenator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0875 / CH0348
    (HB1165 / CH0349)
Jane E. Lawton Conservation Loan ProgramSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Finance
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0985 / CH0365Maryland Clean Energy Center - Green Banks and Clean Bank Financing - StudySenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 365Finance
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB1091 / CH0579Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited LicensesSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SJ0008
    (HJ0008)
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsSenator MuseIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.