Financial Institutions

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 16

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0312
    (SB0077 / CH0008)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Generally (I4)
HB0372Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Residential PropertyDelegate WalkerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0558 / CH0095
    (SB0515)
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion RafflesDelegate ClippingerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 95Economic Matters
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0737 / CH0337
    (SB0288 / CH0336)
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsDelegate Wilson, B.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0929
    (SB0756)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0953
    (SB0372)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB1100Fiduciary Institutions - Disclosure of Financial Records - Federal Investigation AgenciesDelegate Miller, W.In the House - Rereferred to Economic MattersEconomic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
HB1178 / CH0301Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of TrustDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1184
    (SB0835)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Delegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0077 / CH0008
    (HB0312)
Commercial Law - Secured Transactions - False Financing StatementsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 8Finance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Generally (I4)
SB0288 / CH0336
    (HB0737 / CH0337)
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze AssetsSenator LeeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 336Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0372
    (HB0953)
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsSenator FeldmanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0515
    (HB0558 / CH0095)
Financial Institutions - Depository Institutions - Savings Promotion RafflesSenator KlausmeierVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Finance
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0548Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0756
    (HB0929)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015Senator MuseIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0835
    (HB1184)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceReal Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.