Financial Institutions

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 19

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0142
    (SB0033)
Financial Institutions - Mortgage Lenders - Examinations and RecordsChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0230Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - First-Time Homebuyer Savings AccountsDelegate MoralesIn the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0525Maryland Mortgage Lender Law - Mortgage Lender - DefinitionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0568Financial Institutions - Credit Unions - Liens and Rights to a SetoffDelegate ShoemakerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0718 / CH0266
    (SB0206 / CH0265)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencyDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 266Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0752 / CH0203
    (SB0671 / CH0202)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 203Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0782
    (SB0402)
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency ProceedingsDelegate KramerIn the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0872Tax Credits - Enterprise Zones, RISE Zones, and Maryland Jobs Development ProjectsChair, Ways and Means CommitteeIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0974 / CH0518
    (SB0525)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1518Interception of Communication - Financial InstitutionsDelegate AdamsIn the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1638Employee Ownership TrustsDelegate HaynesIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEstates and Trusts (N2)
HJ0004Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking FunctionsDelegate McComasIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Rules and Executive Nominations
3/3/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0206 / CH0265
    (HB0718 / CH0266)
Financial Institutions - Qualifications of Directors of Commercial Banks - ResidencySenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 265Finance
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersFinancial Institutions (I1)
SB0283Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow AccountsSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0392 / CH0484Credit Regulation - Closed End Credit Loans - Elimination of Duplicative DisclosuresSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 484Finance
2/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
SB0402
    (HB0782)
Insurance - Impaired Entities - Delinquency ProceedingsSenator MiddletonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0525
    (HB0974 / CH0518)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0671 / CH0202
    (HB0752 / CH0203)
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial RecordsSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 202Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1101Reverse Mortgages - Property Tax and Insurance Payments - NoticeSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceCommercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:46 P.M.