Financial Regulation, Division of

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0704 / CH0277
    (SB0160 / CH0276)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionDelegate VaughnApproved by the Governor - Chapter 277Economic Matters
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB0723 / CH0421Money Transmission - Protection From Financial Abuse, Financial Exploitation, and Fraud - RequirementsDelegate KramerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 421Economic Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
HB1527Real Property - Bankruptcy Proceedings - Expedited Foreclosure TimelineDelegate BraveboyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive Nominations Real Property (N1)
SB0160 / CH0276
    (HB0704 / CH0277)
Commercial Law - Debt Settlement Services - Sunset and Reporting ExtensionSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276Finance
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters Financial Institutions (I1)
SB1091 / CH0579Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited LicensesSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.