Fingerprinting

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0056 / CH0348State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Criminal History Records ChecksDelegate SmigielApproved by the Governor - Chapter 348Health and Government Operations
1/24/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0712Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General AuthorityDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB0786 / CH0639Juvenile Law - Task Force on Juvenile Court JurisdictionDelegate CarterApproved by the Governor - Chapter 639Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0806 / CH0391Health Occupations - State Board of Social Work Examiners - RevisionsDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 391Health and Government Operations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1100Maryland Compassionate Care ActDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/8/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1255Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - LicensingDelegate NiemannIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1291
    (SB0554)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationDelegate HuckerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0372Health Occupation Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General AuthoritySenator RobeyIn the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0554
    (HB1291)
Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Service - Licensing and CertificationSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0648Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction and DetentionSenator GladdenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0855Carroll County - Public Schools - Collection of Biometric Information from Students - ProhibitedSenator GettyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.