Fingerprinting

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 25

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0060Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013Delegate SmigielIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0215Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate ClusterIn the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0221
    (SB0079 / CH0015)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceDelegate RudolphVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Economic Matters
1/30/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
HB0373Criminal Procedure - Animal Abuser RegistrationDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0401 / CH0598
    (SB0381)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 598Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB0881 / CH0240
    (SB0923 / CH0256)
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionDelegate GlennApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240Health and Government Operations
2/28/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings Public Health (J1)
HB0908 / CH0560
    (SB0849 / CH0559)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesDelegate Nathan-PulliamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 560Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1120
    (SB0387)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB1157 / CH0643Health Occupations - Massage Therapy - Authority to PracticeDelegate HubbardApproved by the Governor - Chapter 643Health and Government Operations
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1173Public Schools - Substitute Teachers - Qualifications, Training, and StudyDelegate KaiserIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB1218 / CH0565
    (SB0854 / CH0564)
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy InternsDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Health and Government Operations
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Health Occupations (J2)
HB1268Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Criminal History Records ChecksDelegate FrankIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/6/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB1293Business Occupations and Professions - Private Process Servers - RegistrationDelegate VaughnIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Economic Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB1472Agriculture - Industrial Hemp - StudyDelegate Fraser-HidalgoIn the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
HB1511Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Adult Dependent Care Providers - Maryland Background Check ProgramChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/14/2014 - 12:30 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0079 / CH0015
    (HB0221)
Limited Lines - Travel InsuranceSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 15Finance
1/22/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Economic Matters Insurance - Other than Health (C4)
SB0107 / CH0130State Lottery - Retailer Licenses - Background InvestigationsChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 130Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/16/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0381
    (HB0401 / CH0598)
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks RequiredSenator ConwayIn the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0387
    (HB1120)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0838Private Process Servers - LicensingSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0849 / CH0559
    (HB0908 / CH0560)
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and PenaltiesSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0854 / CH0564
    (HB1218 / CH0565)
State Board of Pharmacy - Registered Pharmacy InternsSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 564Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0923 / CH0256
    (HB0881 / CH0240)
Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana CommissionSenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 256Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1091 / CH0579Financial Institutions - Registered Mortgage Loan Originators - Expedited LicensesSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 579Finance
3/20/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB1106 / CH0079Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Criminal History Records ChecksSenator FeldmanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.