Fingerprinting

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0017Firearms - Digital Fingerprint Record - Permit RenewalDelegate McConkeyIn the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB0140 / CH0477
    (SB0206)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Sunset Extension and Program EvaluationSpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 477Economic Matters
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0164 / CH0098State Personnel Management System - Background Investigation and Criminal History Records Check - Prospective and Current EmployeesChair, Appropriations CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 98Appropriations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0304
    (SB0243)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionDelegate SydnorIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
HB0312 / CH0618
    (SB0208)
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - FingerprintingDelegate SaabApproved by the Governor - Chapter 618Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0358 / CH0077
    (SB0629 / CH0076)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 77Judiciary
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCriminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB0732
    (SB0153)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsDelegate MaloneIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
HB0972
    (SB0995 / CH0236)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSt. Mary's County DelegationVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environment and Transportation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsCounties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1332Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Renewal Period for Retired Law Enforcement OfficerDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1489
    (SB0171)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckDelegate McComasIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0087 / CH0340Mortgage Loan Originators - State Criminal History Records Check Requirement - RepealChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 340Finance
1/14/2016 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Financial Institutions (I1)
SB0109 / CH0048Health Occupations Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - RequiredChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 48Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB0153
    (HB0732)
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification DocumentsSenator ReillyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/2/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration (R4)
SB0171
    (HB1489)
Guardianship of a Minor or Disabled Person - Criminal History Records CheckSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0206
    (HB0140 / CH0477)
Security Systems Technicians and Agencies - Fees and Repeal of Sunset Provision and Program EvaluationPresidentIn the House - Conference Committee AppointedEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Economic MattersBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0208
    (HB0312 / CH0618)
Public Safety - Renewal of Handgun Permits - FingerprintingSenator HoughVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0243
    (HB0304)
Juvenile Court - JurisdictionSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Juvenile Law (E3)
SB0629 / CH0076
    (HB0358 / CH0077)
Kent County - Prospective Employees and Volunteers - Criminal History Records CheckSenator HersheyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 76Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
SB0995 / CH0236
    (HB0972)
St. Mary's County - Local Licenses - RepealSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 236Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and TransportationCounties - Local Laws (L2)
SB1142State Department of Education - McArdle Early Intervention Scholarship ProgramSenator BatesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.