Fingerprinting

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 6

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0166Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - RevisionsChair, Health and Government Operations CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government OperationsHealth Occupations (J2)
HB1534
    (SB1153)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
HB1634 / CH0731
    (SB1068 / CH0732)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Delegate FrickApproved by the Governor - Chapter 731Economic Matters
2/16/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0908Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013Senator WaughIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB1068 / CH0732
    (HB1634 / CH0731)
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2018Senator RosapepeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 732Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1153
    (HB1534)
Handgun Permits - Criminal History Check - Fingerprint Submission ExceptionSenator ReadyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 21, 2018 10:36 A.M.