Fish and Fishing

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 27

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0096 / CH0080Natural Resources - Restricted Shellfish Harvest Areas - Water TestingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 80Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0241
    (SB0163)
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - ExemptionDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0306
    (SB0464 / CH0057)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery PermitsDelegate O'DonnellVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0357 / CH0235
    (SB0344 / CH0234)
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and PenaltyDelegate WoodApproved by the Governor - Chapter 235Environmental Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0505Natural Resources - Hunting and Fishing License Applications - Social Security NumberDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0514Recreational Hunting or Fishing License Applications - Disclosure of InformationDelegate O'DonnellIn the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0622Natural Resources - Oyster Harvesting - Distribution of Oyster TagsDelegate SzeligaIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0708 / CH0285
    (SB0547 / CH0284)
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - PenaltiesDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 285Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsNatural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0797 / CH0140Transportation Projects - Transportation Facilities - Water AccessDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 140Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Transportation - Generally (R2)
HB1148 / CH0297
    (SB0592 / CH0296)
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or DistributionDelegate LuedtkeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 297Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1241
    (SB0525)
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement FundDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1243Environment - Water Pollution Control - PenaltiesDelegate JacobsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1253
    (SB0662 / CH0519)
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - LicensingDelegate JacobsVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Environmental Matters
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1257 / CH0674Land Use - Clarifications and CorrectionsDelegate McIntoshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 674Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Local Government - Generally (L6)
HB1372 / CH0430
    (SB0934)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsDelegate JonesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationPrior Authorizations (B4)
HB1528Natural Resources - Patuxent River - Drifting Gill NetsDelegate O'DonnellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0046Natural Resources - Shark or Elasmobranch Fins - Restriction on Possession, Distribution, or ConsumptionSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0059 / CH0173Natural Resources - Fish and FisheriesChair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 173Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/15/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0163
    (HB0241)
Commercial Fishing and Seafood Operations - Nuisance Actions - ExemptionSenator PipkinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0344 / CH0234
    (HB0357 / CH0235)
Potomac River Fisheries Commission - Inspection Tax and PenaltySenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 234Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0464 / CH0057
    (HB0306)
Natural Resources - Aquaculture - Shellfish Nursery PermitsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0525
    (HB1241)
Fishing - Sustainable Fisheries Enforcement FundSenator ColburnIn the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0547 / CH0284
    (HB0708 / CH0285)
Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - PenaltiesSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 284Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0592 / CH0296
    (HB1148 / CH0297)
Natural Resources - Shark Fins - Restriction on Possession or DistributionSenator FroshApproved by the Governor - Chapter 296Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental MattersHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0619Wildlife Management and Sustainability Act of 2013Senator AstleIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0662 / CH0519
    (HB1253)
Natural Resources - Commercial Fishing - LicensingSenator MathiasApproved by the Governor - Chapter 519Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0934
    (HB1372 / CH0430)
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - AlterationsSenator DeGrangeIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Prior Authorizations (B4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.