Fish and Fishing

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 11

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0004 / CH0462
    (SB0046 / CH0463)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, and Disabled VeteransDelegate SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 462Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0029Tidal Fish License - Catching Crabs Using Trotline Gear - HolidaysDelegate Howard, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0068 / CH0461Hunting and Fishing - Discounted Licenses - Purple Heart RecipientsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 461Environment and Transportation
1/25/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0211 / CH0398
    (SB0268 / CH0399)
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on ContestsDelegate RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 398Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB0368Hunting and Fishing Licenses and Stamps - Seniors, Veterans, and Military Personnel (Howard's Law)Delegate MetzgarIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1314 / CH0400Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysDelegate JacobsApproved by the Governor - Chapter 400Environment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
HB1339
    (SB0554)
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh SizeDelegate JacobsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0046 / CH0463
    (HB0004 / CH0462)
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled VeteransSenator SimonaireApproved by the Governor - Chapter 463Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0059 / CH0401Crabs - Harvest Times - HolidaysSenator WaughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 401Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/24/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0268 / CH0399
    (HB0211 / CH0398)
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on ContestsSenator YoungApproved by the Governor - Chapter 399Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)
SB0554
    (HB1339)
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh SizeSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Hunting and Fishing (M2)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 8, 2017 2:42 P.M.