Flood Control

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 12

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0097 / CH0081Environment - Sediment Control and Stormwater Management Plans - AuthorityChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81Environmental Matters
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0121
    (SB0323)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater ManagementDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 10:00 a.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0434
    (SB0317)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental MattersEnvironment (M3)
HB0508Environment - Local Stormwater Management Charges - State PropertyDelegate CarrIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)Environmental Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
HB0613 / CH0624Sustainable Communities - Designation and FinancingChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 624Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0694Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption from Watershed Protection and Restoration ProgramDelegate KrebsIn the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0706 / CH0384Natural Resources - Forest Preservation Act of 2013Chair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 384Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB1030 / CH0660Property Tax Credit - Urban Agricultural Property - DefinitionDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 660Ways and Means
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/2/2013 - 1:30 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1437
    (SB1015)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement ProjectDelegate LoveIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/9/2013 - 12:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB0317
    (HB0434)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0323
    (HB0121)
Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater ManagementSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
SB1015
    (HB1437)
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - MTR Land Enhancement ProjectSenator AstleIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2013 - 3:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.