Flood Control

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 33

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0050
    (SB0464)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate NormanIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0055
    (SB0316)
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)Delegate SchuhIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0058 / CH0380
    (SB0073)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsDelegate Haddaway-RiccioApproved by the Governor - Chapter 380Environmental Matters
1/29/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
HB0097
    (SB0005)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate BatesIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0155Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration ProgramDelegate KrebsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0267Creation of a State Debt - Frederick County - Culler Lake Stormwater Management ProjectDelegate ClagettIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
3/8/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Debt (Bond Bills) (B2)
HB0324
    (SB0277)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionFrederick County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB0473
    (SB0787)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesDelegate SummersIn the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)Ways and Means
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0615 / CH0415Coast Smart CouncilChair, Environmental Matters CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 415Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/1/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0718
    (SB0707)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Delegate CarrIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0742 / CH0531
    (SB0600 / CH0530)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramDelegate WalkerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 531Ways and Means
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0878 / CH0430
    (SB0814)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationDelegate SteinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 430Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Transportation - Highways (R1)
HB0895Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0910Water Quality Certification - Conowingo Dam - Required StudiesDelegate RudolphIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0952Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionDelegate McDonoughIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; WithdrawnEnvironmental Matters Environment (M3)
HB1028Prince George's County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Report on County Funding Plan PG 417-14Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
3/7/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Counties - Local Laws (L2)
HB1139Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Reduction of FeesDelegate OlszewskiIn the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0005
    (HB0097)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator KittlemanIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Environment (M3)
SB0073
    (HB0058 / CH0380)
Talbot County - Chesapeake Bay Critical Area - Prosecution or Civil Suit for Certain ViolationsSenator ColburnVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/21/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/3/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Natural Resources - Generally (M1)
SB0277
    (HB0324)
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - ExemptionSenator BrinkleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0315Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fee - County Tax LimitationsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
SB0316
    (HB0055)
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0317Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Stormwater Remediation Fee (Rain Tax)Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0318Property Tax - Sunshine Tax Credit Act of 2014Senator SimonaireIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; WithdrawnBudget and Taxation Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0359Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - DefinitionSenator StoneIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0464
    (HB0050)
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - RepealSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0600 / CH0530
    (HB0742 / CH0531)
Regional Institution Strategic Enterprise Zone ProgramSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 530Budget and Taxation
3/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0707
    (HB0718)
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2014Senator RaskinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0787
    (HB0473)
Economic Development - Green Business Incentive ZonesSenator RamirezIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0814
    (HB0878 / CH0430)
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - SpecificationSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsBudget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations Transportation - Highways (R1)
SB0903Tax Sales - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Temporary ProhibitionSenator HersheyIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB1084Baltimore County - Stormwater Remediation Fee - Application and LimitationBaltimore County SenatorsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.Rules Environment (M3)
SB1116Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of FundsSenator SimonaireIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesRules Natural Resources - Generally (M1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.