Food Stamps

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0533Food Stamp Program - Time Limit Waiver - ProhibitionDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsAppropriations
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0586 / CH0395
    (SB0278 / CH0396)
Maryland Farms and Families ActDelegate HettlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 395Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Agriculture (M4)
HB0860 / CH0793
    (SB0853 / CH0792)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Delegate LiermanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0278 / CH0396
    (HB0586 / CH0395)
Maryland Farms and Families ActSenator MiddletonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 396Finance
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0853 / CH0792
    (HB0860 / CH0793)
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)Senator MadalenoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792Finance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/5/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

November 28, 2017 1:16 P.M.