Foreclosure

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 10

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0125Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Attorney's FeesDelegate StukesIn the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 2:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0286 / CH0449
    (SB0161 / CH0448)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensDelegate NiemannApproved by the Governor - Chapter 449Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0518Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and FeesDelegate StukesIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0628Real Property - Maryland Contract Lien Act - Monetary JudgmentsDelegate NormanIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0811Residential Property - Foreclosure of Liens by Common Ownership CommunitiesDelegate NiemannIn the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1008Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013Delegate HealeyIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1147Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Required Documents - Request for Waiver of Mediation Filing FeeDelegate KipkeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1308 / CH0515
    (SB0642 / CH0514)
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial EvictionsDelegate HealeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515Environmental Matters
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
SB0161 / CH0448
    (HB0286 / CH0449)
Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Foreclosure of LiensSenator KelleyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 448Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0642 / CH0514
    (HB1308 / CH0515)
Residential Property - Prohibition on Nonjudicial EvictionsSenator MuseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 514Judicial Proceedings
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
4/4/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.