Foreclosure

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0511 / CH0428Real Property - Residential Property - Ground LeasesDelegate HolmesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 428Environment and Transportation
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0607Prince George's County - Property Tax - Transforming Neighborhood Initiative Residential Rehabilitation Tax Credit PG 414-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; WithdrawnWays and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB0840Real Property - Foreclosure - Prohibition on Deficiency JudgmentDelegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0929
    (SB0756)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015 PG 423-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the House - First Reading Environment and TransportationEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0935 / CH0289Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 410-15Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 289Ways and Means
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1035 / CH0114
    (SB0439)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesDelegate OaksApproved by the Governor - Chapter 114Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1144Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1168Real Property - Foreclosure - Residential Property - Prefile MediationDelegate McConkeyIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
HB1177Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and TaxationWays and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
HB1178 / CH0301Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of TrustDelegate LaffertyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 301Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)
HB1184
    (SB0835)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Delegate KnottsIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1195
    (SB0877)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Delegate Robinson, B.In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1197
    (SB0875)
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of DeficiencyDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
HB1215
    (SB0876)
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False StatementsDelegate Robinson, B.In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0057
    (HB0072 / CH0489)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015PresidentIn the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/4/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Operating Budget (B1)
SB0439
    (HB1035 / CH0114)
Baltimore City - Tax SalesSenator McFaddenVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0756
    (HB0929)
Prince George's County - Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015Senator MuseIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Rosapepe)Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0783Foreclosure Sales of Residential Property - Motion for Deficiency JudgmentSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0835
    (HB1184)
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)Senator MuseIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceReal Property (N1)
SB0875
    (HB1197)
Real Property - Foreclosure - Owner-Occupied Residential Property - Prohibition on Collection of DeficiencySenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Real Property (N1)
SB0876
    (HB1215)
Foreclosure - Indorsement of Debt Instrument, Lost Note Affidavit, and Penalties for False StatementsSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0877
    (HB1195)
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015Senator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.