Foreclosure

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 20

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0508
    (SB0330)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingDelegate LaffertyIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0524Foreclosure - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration RequirementDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; WithdrawnEnvironment and TransportationReal Property (N1)
HB0538Real Property - Notices of Foreclosure Sale and Postponement or Cancellation of Foreclosure SaleDelegate HolmesIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0664Foreclosures - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property and Registration RequirementDelegate KrimmIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB0684 / CH0029
    (SB0558)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedDelegate HammenEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB0712Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human HabitationBaltimore County DelegationIn the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
3/17/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB0762Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB0970 / CH0566
    (SB0591 / CH0565)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 566Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
HB1153Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 431-16Prince George's County DelegationIn the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2016 - 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)
HB1171Foreclosed Property Registry - Responsibility for Maintenance of Residential Property, Registration Requirement, and Access to RegistryDelegate LisantiIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1192 / CH0735
    (SB0816)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesDelegate McMillanEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735Environment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsReal Property (N1)
HB1274
    (SB0836)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)Environment and Transportation
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1286Residential Property - Foreclosed Property Registry - Notification to Local JurisdictionsDelegate LongIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
HB1377Real Property - Vacant and Abandoned Property - Expedited ForeclosureDelegate ParrottIn the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0330
    (HB0508)
Residential Property - Foreclosure Sale - Recordation of Instrument of WritingSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0456Tax Sales - Reimbursement for ExpensesSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing cancelledBudget and TaxationTaxes - Property (Q1)
SB0558
    (HB0684 / CH0029)
Baltimore Regional Neighborhood Initiative Program - CodifiedSenator FergusonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by AppropriationsBudget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
AppropriationsEconomic and Community Development (C8)
SB0591 / CH0565
    (HB0970 / CH0566)
Tax Sales - Condominium Assessments and Homeowners Association FeesSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 565Budget and Taxation
3/2/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Property (Q1)
SB0816
    (HB1192 / CH0735)
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Resales - Disclosures and FeesSenator MuseIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsReal Property (N1)
SB0836
    (HB1274)
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program ActSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.