Forfeiture

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 4

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0713 / CH0636Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture - Property Used in Human TraffickingDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 636Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Procedure (E2)
HB1225Criminal Law - Drive-By Shooting - Forfeiture of Motor VehicleDelegate KachIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1264Task Force to Study Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Public Officials Charged with or Convicted of a CrimeDelegate GeorgeIn the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
State Pensions and Retirement (K4)
HB1453Criminal Law - Marijuana - Regulation, Penalties, and TaxationDelegate AndersonIn the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.