Forgery

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 5

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0969
    (SB0688)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActDelegate HixsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1289 / CH0308
    (SB0941)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionDelegate DumaisApproved by the Governor - Chapter 308Judiciary
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0018State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for DisciplineSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental AffairsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0688
    (HB0969)
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling ActSenator BensonIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0941
    (HB1289 / CH0308)
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - RevisionSenator RaskinIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsJudicial Proceedings
4/7/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.