Forms

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 23

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0033 / CH0760Guardianship of Disabled Persons - Voluntary Admission to Mental FacilityDelegate LamApproved by the Governor - Chapter 760Health and Government Operations
1/18/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0335
    (SB0338)
State Personnel – Grievance ProceduresDelegate HaynesVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Appropriations
2/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0534Firearms - Right to Purchase, Own, Possess, and Carry - Medical Cannabis (Patients' Rights Act)Delegate GrammerIn the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)Judiciary
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
Public Safety (E4)
HB0749
    (SB0551)
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – EnforcementDelegate Lewis, R.In the Senate - First Reading Judicial ProceedingsEnvironment and Transportation
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsVehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
HB0776
    (SB0492 / CH0468)
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care StudyDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesHealth and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesState Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0777
    (SB0649)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseDelegate DumaisIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
HB0798 / CH0311Visual Impairments - Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Delegate KittlemanApproved by the Governor - Chapter 311Ways and Means
2/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0937Business Regulation - Household Goods Movers - RegistrationDelegate FlanaganIn the Senate - Second Reading Passed with AmendmentsEconomic Matters
2/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0989
    (SB0877 / CH0350)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)SpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
HB1081
    (SB1050)
Civil Actions – Body Attachment – ProceduresDelegate BarronIn the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1346Gaming - Wagering on Sporting Events - Authorization and ImplementationDelegate BuckelIn the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/2/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
HB1513Commercial Law - Maryland Credit Repair Businesses ActDelegate FennellIn the House - Referred to interim study by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation (I2)
HB1615 / CH0408
    (SB1231)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 408Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0245 / CH0712Procurement – Security Requirements – FormsSenator RobinsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 712Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0492 / CH0468
    (HB0776)
Procurement - Board of Public Works - Workforce Health Care StudySenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 468Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
SB0551
    (HB0749)
Vehicle Laws - Bus Lane Monitoring Cameras - AuthorizationSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road (R5)
SB0570 / CH0312Visual Impairments – Requirements for Student Vision Screening and Information (Atticus Act)Senator BatesApproved by the Governor - Chapter 312Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
4/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB0649
    (HB0777)
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving SpouseSenator KelleyIn the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Estates and Trusts (N2)
SB0877 / CH0350
    (HB0989)
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)PresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 350Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic and Community Development (C8)
SB0912 / CH0559
    (HB1685 / CH0558)
Maryland Prenatal and Infant Care Coordination Services Grant Program Fund (Thrive by Three Fund)Senator FergusonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 559Finance
3/1/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB1050
    (HB1081)
Civil Actions - Body Attachment - ProceduresSenator SmithIn the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB1223 / CH0214
    (HB1452 / CH0213)
Controlled Dangerous Substances Registration – Authorized Providers – Continuing EducationSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 214Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/3/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB1231
    (HB1615 / CH0408)
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance ProgramSenator MadalenoIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsSocial Services - Generally (O1)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:54 P.M.