Foster Care

2013 Regular Session

Total Bills: 24

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0228 / CH0159
    (SB0274)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013SpeakerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 159Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Insurance - Health (C3)
HB0277
    (SB0264 / CH0036)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0278
    (SB0265 / CH0037)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judiciary CommitteeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0632Family Investment Program - State Government Hiring Plans - ApplicationDelegate Kelly, K.In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB0916 / CH0651
    (SB0791)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceDelegate Valentino-SmithApproved by the Governor - Chapter 651Judiciary
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsJuvenile Law (E3)
HB1012 / CH0260
    (SB0414 / CH0259)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsDelegate WilsonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 260Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB1013
    (SB0543)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesDelegate WilsonIn the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.Appropriations
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1119 / CH0317
    (SB0752 / CH0316)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 317Appropriations
3/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1125
    (SB0388)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
HB1297 / CH0330
    (SB0897 / CH0329)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsDelegate ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 330Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1331Labor and Employment - Parental Leave - Birth or Adoption of a ChildDelegate Kelly, A.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
HB1460
    (SB1010)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesDelegate RudolphIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsFamily Law (D4)
HB1492
    (SB0387)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenDelegate WilsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0264 / CH0036
    (HB0277)
Children in Need of Assistance - Review HearingsChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 36Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0265 / CH0037
    (HB0278)
Children in Need of Assistance - Rights of Preadoptive Parents, Foster Parents, and Caregivers of ChildChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 37Judicial Proceedings
2/7/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0274
    (HB0228 / CH0159)
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013PresidentIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive NominationsInsurance - Health (C3)
SB0387
    (HB1492)
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0388
    (HB1125)
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - ChildrenSenator KelleyIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0414 / CH0259
    (HB1012 / CH0260)
Higher Education - Tuition Waiver - Foster Care RecipientsSenator KingApproved by the Governor - Chapter 259Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0543
    (HB1013)
Foster Care Recipients - Waiver of Tuition and Other ChargesSenator FroshIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0752 / CH0316
    (HB1119 / CH0317)
Department of Budget and Management - Foster Youth Summer Internship Pilot ProgramSenator RobeyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 316Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0791
    (HB0916 / CH0651)
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement GuidanceSenator KelleyIn the House - Rereferred to JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
JudiciaryJuvenile Law (E3)
SB0897 / CH0329
    (HB1297 / CH0330)
Consumer Protection - Security Freezes - Children in Foster Care SettingsSenator KlausmeierApproved by the Governor - Chapter 329Finance
3/12/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB1010
    (HB1460)
Children with Developmental Disabilities in State Custody - Continuation of Placement and ServicesSenator BrinkleyIn the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/21/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
4/5/2013 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:29 P.M.