Foster Care

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 17

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0171
    (SB0150 / CH0326)
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)Delegate AfzaliVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB0199Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Unreimbursed Expenses of Foster Parents - Child Placement AgencyCharles County DelegationIn the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0439
    (SB0685 / CH0046)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenDelegate Washington, M.Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
HB0564 / CH0435State Personnel - Limits on Use of Leave for Birth, Adoption, Foster Placement, or Care of ChildDelegate KellyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 435Appropriations
3/6/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/2/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Personnel (P4)
HB0575
    (SB0524)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate Valentino-SmithIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudiciary
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0642
    (SB0508 / CH0180)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsDelegate LuedtkeVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Ways and Means
3/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsPublic Safety (E4)
HB0643
    (SB0567 / CH0366)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportDelegate ZuckerVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial ProceedingsChildren (O4)
HB0788
    (SB0669)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiIn the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/5/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0858
    (SB0141)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareDelegate Pena-MelnykIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; WithdrawnHealth and Government Operations
3/10/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0141
    (HB0858)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareSenator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinance
2/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0150 / CH0326
    (HB0171)
Courts - Child Abuse and Neglect - Waiver of Reunification Efforts (Anayah's Law)Senator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 326Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0508 / CH0180
    (HB0642)
Children - Child Care Facilities, Public Schools, and Nonpublic Schools - Contractors and SubcontractorsSenator HoughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 180Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Safety (E4)
SB0524
    (HB0575)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the House - Unfavorable Report by JudiciaryJudicial Proceedings
2/18/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0567 / CH0366
    (HB0643)
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - ReportSenator GladdenApproved by the Governor - Chapter 366Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
4/8/2015 - 2:00 p.m.
Children (O4)
SB0609
    (HB1022)
State Government - Office of the Child Welfare Ombudsman - Pilot ProgramSenator BrochinIn the House - Hearing 4/13 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials (P1)
SB0669
    (HB0788)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsSenator YoungIn the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0685 / CH0046
    (HB0439)
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster ChildrenSenator BensonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 46Judicial Proceedings
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.