Foster Care

2016 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0360 / CH0719
    (SB0073)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Foster Care RecipientsDelegate JalisiEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsHigher Education (F2)
HB0400 / CH0263Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless Youth - ModificationsDelegate Washington, M.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 263Ways and Means
2/25/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB0511 / CH0058
    (SB0252 / CH0057)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareDelegate CullisonApproved by the Governor - Chapter 58Health and Government Operations
2/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0772
    (SB0262)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodyDelegate MoonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; WithdrawnJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
HB0778Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesWays and Means
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesPrimary and Secondary Education (F1)
HB0976CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartyDelegate RosenbergIn the Senate - First Reading Senate RulesJudiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
RulesFamily Law (D4)
HB1106
    (SB0921)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsDelegate FrickVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Economic Matters
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/5/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1162 / CH0079
    (SB0785 / CH0078)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramDelegate ReznikApproved by the Governor - Chapter 79Appropriations
3/1/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
HB1288 / CH0306Higher Education - Tuition Waivers for Foster Care Recipients and Unaccompanied Homeless YouthDelegate Young, P.Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306Appropriations
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
HB1465Foster Care - Standards for Foster ParentsDelegate Washington, M.In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
3/3/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0073
    (HB0360 / CH0719)
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Orphans and Foster Care RecipientsSenator YoungIn the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and MeansEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2016 - 3:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/24/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Higher Education (F2)
SB0077 / CH0157Human Resources - Transition Planning for Foster YouthChair, Judicial Proceedings CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 157Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/23/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0094 / CH0344Workforce Development - RevisionsChair, Finance CommitteeApproved by the Governor - Chapter 344Finance
1/21/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Private Sector Labor and Industry (K3)
SB0252 / CH0057
    (HB0511 / CH0058)
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Former Foster Care Adolescents - Dental CareSenator PughApproved by the Governor - Chapter 57Finance
2/3/2016 - 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
SB0262
    (HB0772)
Family Law - Protecting the Resources of Children in State CustodySenator RaskinIn the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Zirkin)Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0704CINA Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Blindness of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartySenator GladdenIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; WithdrawnJudicial ProceedingsFamily Law (D4)
SB0765 / CH0423CINA, Guardianship, Adoption, Custody, and Visitation - Disability of Parent, Guardian, Custodian, or PartySenator RaskinApproved by the Governor - Chapter 423Judicial Proceedings
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/7/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Family Law (D4)
SB0785 / CH0078
    (HB1162 / CH0079)
Foster Youth Summer Internship ProgramSenator ZuckerApproved by the Governor - Chapter 78Finance
3/10/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/29/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB0921
    (HB1106)
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard RevisionsSenator PughVetoed by the Governor (Policy)Finance
3/8/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
SB0950Education - Students With Disabilities - Study of Parental Consent in the Individualized Education Program ProcessSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Third Reading Passed (45-0)Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/9/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/31/2016 - 1:00 p.m.
Primary and Secondary Education (F1)
SB1014Maryland Clean Energy Jobs Act of 2016Senator PughIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesUtility Regulation (C5)

Denotes enacted legislation

September 23, 2016 2:04 P.M.