Fraud

2017 Regular Session

Total Bills: 21

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0212 / CH0827
    (SB0270 / CH0828)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesDelegate WaldstreicherEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 827Economic Matters
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB0321 / CH0361Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Audit Committee and Office of the Inspector General MC/PG 110-17Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County DelegationApproved by the Governor - Chapter 361Environment and Transportation
3/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Bi-County Agencies (L5)
HB0353 / CH0441Election Law - Change in Administrative Policy Affecting Voting Rights - NoticeDelegate RosenbergApproved by the Governor - Chapter 441Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0424
    (SB0304 / CH0379)
Taxpayer Protection ActSpeakerIn the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
HB0532
    (SB1133)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentityDelegate ParrottIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Elections (G1)
HB0547Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection ActDelegate CilibertiIn the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/10/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB0603 / CH0345Vehicle Laws - Out-of-State Vehicles - Required SecurityDelegate ParrottApproved by the Governor - Chapter 345Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)
HB0974 / CH0518
    (SB0525)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsDelegate CareyApproved by the Governor - Chapter 518Economic Matters
3/1/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
HB1022Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist OrdersDelegate WestIn the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1292State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental PracticeDelegate WestIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.Health and Government Operations
3/13/2017 - 12:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
HB1584
    (SB1124)
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for ViolationsDelegate AngelIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsHealth Occupations (J2)
SB0227Gaming - Video Lottery Operation Licensees - Confiscation of Fake IdentificationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/8/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Gaming (C7)
SB0270 / CH0828
    (HB0212 / CH0827)
Consumer Protection - Credit Report Security Freezes - Prohibition on Fees and Required NoticesSenator LeeEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 828Finance
2/7/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Economic MattersCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0304 / CH0379
    (HB0424)
Taxpayer Protection ActPresidentApproved by the Governor - Chapter 379Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
4/4/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Income (Q3)
SB0444Service Animals - Aggravated Cruelty and False RepresentationSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial ProceedingsJudicial Proceedings
2/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes (E1)
SB0525
    (HB0974 / CH0518)
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - RevisionsSenator LeeIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsFinance
2/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive NominationsCommercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)
SB0530Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community ManagersSenator BensonIn the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Real Property (N1)
SB0699
    (HB0467 / CH0782)
Providing Our Workers Education and Readiness (POWER) - Apprenticeship ActSenator RosapepeIn the House - Second Reading PassedFinance
3/9/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
Economic MattersCapital Budget (B5)
SB1092Public Assistance Fraud Prevention ActSenator JenningsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Social Services - Generally (O1)
SB1124
    (HB1584)
Maryland Dentistry Act - Scope of Practice and Penalties for ViolationsSenator ConwayIn the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2017 - 1:00 p.m.
Health Occupations (J2)
SB1133
    (HB0532)
Election Law - Qualification of Voters - Proof of IdentitySenator OaksIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; WithdrawnRulesElections (G1)

Denotes enacted legislation

June 7, 2017 9:53 A.M.