Fuel

2014 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0005State Board of Plumbing - Continuing Professional Competency - Master Plumbers and Master Natural Gas FittersChair, Economic Matters CommitteeIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
HB0292Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0347
    (SB0365)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate SchuhIn the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0567Procurement - State Vehicle Fleet - Biodiesel or Biofuel RequirementsDelegate BromwellIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government OperationsHealth and Government Operations
2/12/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
State Government - Procurement (P2)
HB0865Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection ActDelegate MizeurIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1030Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and FundDelegate MorhaimIn the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Public Health (J1)
HB1122
    (SB0745)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Delegate MizeurIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental MattersEnvironmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0360Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
Environment (M3)
SB0361Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - Best Available TechnologySenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0362Public Safety - Gas Pipeline Inspection Requirements - State PenaltiesSenator ZirkinIn the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/4/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0365
    (HB0347)
Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator GettyIn the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/5/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB0535Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)
SB0631Environment - Retail Service Stations - Setback CertificationSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0678 / CH0325Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup FundSenator ConwayApproved by the Governor - Chapter 325Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0745
    (HB1122)
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014Senator YoungIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; WithdrawnEducation, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:35 P.M.