Fuel

2015 Regular Session

Total Bills: 13

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0072 / CH0489
    (SB0057)
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2015SpeakerEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 489Appropriations
3/3/2015 - 3:00 p.m.
Budget and TaxationOperating Budget (B1)
HB0449 / CH0481
    (SB0409 / CH0480)
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - RegulationsDelegate Fraser-HidalgoEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental AffairsEnvironment (M3)
HB0458Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic FracturingDelegate Robinson, S.In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and TransportationEnvironment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB0508Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0516
    (SB0009)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/26/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0928Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of ExemptionDelegate WalkerIn the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Ways and Means
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB1073Environment - Crude Oil Rail Transport - Risk Assessment and Accident Prevention StudyDelegate LamIn the Senate - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Finance
4/8/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1096Agriculture - Weight and Measure Requirements - Exemption for Biodiesel Purchasing CooperativeDelegate RosenbergIn the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Agriculture (M4)
SB0009
    (HB0516)
Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer Rights and Required ReportsSenator McFaddenIn the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.Finance
2/17/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
SB0029Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - ProhibitionsSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/3/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB0035Baltimore County - Miscellaneous Business Licenses - FeesSenator BrochinIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; WithdrawnFinanceBusiness Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB0458Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability ActSenator ZirkinIn the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
4/1/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SB0712Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact AccountSenator EdwardsIn the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Denotes enacted legislation

December 8, 2015 2:41 P.M.