Fuel

2018 Regular Session

Total Bills: 15

View Prior Year Legislation

Number / Chapter
(Cross File / Chapter)
 
TitlePrimary SponsorStatusOriginal House
and Hearing Dates
Opposite House
and Hearing Dates
Broad Subject
HB0272Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionDelegate ClusterIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and MeansWays and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
HB0878Public Utilities - Renewable Energy - Electric and Gas Bills (100% Clean Renewable Energy Equity Act of 2018)Delegate RobinsonIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB0939Regional Carbon Cost Collection InitiativeDelegate KramerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/5/2018 - 2:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
HB1274Gas and Electricity - Smart Meters - Customer RightsDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1333Gas and Electricity - Analog Meters - Purchase and InstallationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1387Consumer Relations - Natural Gas Infrastructure - Notice of WorkDelegate ClippingerIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; WithdrawnEconomic MattersUtility Regulation (C5)
HB1456 / CH0626
    (SB1128)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActDelegate BarveApproved by the Governor - Chapter 626Judiciary
3/7/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial ProceedingsCivil Actions and Procedures (D3)
HB1463Gas and Electricity - Analog, Digital, and Smart Meters - Meter Exchange and Transmission of InformationDelegate GlassIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HB1667Gas and Electric Companies - Deposit ChargesDelegate JalisiIn the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic MattersEconomic Matters
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Utility Regulation (C5)
HJ0013Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing ProgramDelegate FlanaganIn the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive NominationsRules and Executive NominationsEnvironment (M3)
SB0457Sales and Use Tax - Rate ReductionSenator SallingIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and TaxationBudget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)
SB1029Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - RestrictionsSenator MadalenoIn the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/6/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment (M3)
SB1046Gas Price Clarity Act of 2018Senator KaganIn the Senate - Unfavorable Report by FinanceFinance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Business Regulation and Occupations (C2)
SB1128
    (HB1456 / CH0626)
Offshore Drilling Liability ActSenator MathiasVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Civil Actions and Procedures (D3)
SJ0011Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas DrillingSenator MathiasIn the House - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 a.m.
Environment (M3)

Denotes enacted legislation

May 29, 2018 3:55 P.M.